ND HB1130 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 89
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 89
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 57 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a provider assessment for nursing facilities; and to provide a penalty.
Title
A provider assessment for nursing facilities; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 1 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 89 |
2017-01-31 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2017-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-01-11 | House | Rereferred to Human Services |
2017-01-11 | House | Request return from committee |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |