ND HB1107 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 43-23.3-01 and 43-23.3-02, subsection 1 of section 43-23.3-03, sections 43-23.3-04 and 43-23.3-05, subsection 1 of section 43-23.3-06, and sections 43-23.3-07, 43-23.3-08, 43-23.3-09, 43-23.3-10, 43-23.3-11, 43-23.3-13, 43-23.3-17, 43-23.3-18, and 43-23.3-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the regulation of real estate appraisers; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The regulation of real estate appraisers; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12 |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2023-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 2 |
2023-04-03 | House | Concurred |
2023-03-23 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Workforce Development |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-02 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 3 |
2023-02-01 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2023-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2023-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Industry, Business and Labor |