ND HB1084 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 25-06 and a new section to chapter 25-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal history record checks; and to amend and reenact paragraph 5 of subdivision x of subsection 2 of section 12-60-24 and paragraph 5 of subdivision y of subsection 2 of section 12-60-24 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal history record checks.
Title
Criminal history record checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 63 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 63 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by Governor 03/08 |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-28 | House | Returned to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 3 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 63 nays 28 |
2019-01-11 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-01-09 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 5 0 |
2019-01-09 | House | Committee Hearing 09:20 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |