ND HB1084 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 57
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 57
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 39-04-08, 39-04-10.4, and 39-04-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to number plates.
Title
Number plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 34 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-11 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 57 |
2017-01-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 6 0 |
2017-01-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |