ND HB1072 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by Governor 03/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by Governor 03/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 65-04-27.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to cease and desist orders; to amend and reenact section 65-01-02, subsection 4 of section 65-01-08, sections 65-01-10, 65-04-04, 65-04-06, 65-04-19, 65-04-22, 65-04-24, and 65-04-26.2, subsection 3 of section 65-04-32, section 65-04-33, and subsection 1 of section 65-09-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to definitions, the removal of the word "annual", off-setting premiums, the organizational seal, payroll reports, payment of premiums, premiums in default, notice of premium owing, liability of a general contractor, notices of decision, noncompliance of employers, and liability of uninsured employers; to repeal section 65-06.2-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to safety and performance reviews; to provide a penalty; and to provide for an application.
Title
Safety and performance reviews; to provide a penalty; and to provide for an application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Governor 03/06 |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-28 | House | Returned to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2019-01-11 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-07 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |