ND HB1072 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 26.1-36 and a new section to chapter 54-52.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to insurance coverage of cancer treatment medications; and to provide for application.
Title
Insurance coverage of cancer treatment medications; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Maragos [R] | Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] |
Sen. Dick Dever [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Signed by Governor 04/13 |
2015-04-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 58 nays 34 |
2015-04-08 | House | Concurred |
2015-04-06 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 33 nays 14 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 60 nays 33 |
2015-02-16 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 1 |
2015-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2015-01-08 | House | Rereferred to Human Services |
2015-01-08 | House | Request return from committee |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |