ND HB1031 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-06-37 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authorization to purchase or lease aircraft.
Title
Authorization to purchase or lease aircraft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-01-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 43 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 5 |
2017-01-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-16 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-11 | House | Rereferred to Government and Veterans Affairs |
2017-01-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |