ND HB1015 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of corrections and rehabilitation; to provide an appropriation to the legislative council; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide legislative intent.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of corrections and rehabilitation; to provide an appropriation to the legislative council; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide legislative intent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Signed by Governor 04/28 |
2015-04-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 4 |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Wanzek Krebsbach Robinson |
2015-04-15 | House | Conference committee appointed J. Nelson Pollert Holman |
2015-04-15 | House | Refused to concur |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 7 |
2015-02-25 | House | Division B passed |
2015-02-25 | House | Division A lost |
2015-02-25 | House | Division of bill |
2015-02-24 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-24 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 2 0 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-02-03 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-01-13 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2015-01-13 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-01-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2015-01-13 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |