ND HB1006 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the office of the tax commissioner and for payment of state reimbursement under the homestead tax credit and disabled veterans' credit; to provide for a continuing appropriation; to provide for transfers; to provide an exemption; to create and enact a new section to chapter? 57-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a multistate tax audit fund; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A multistate tax audit fund; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by Governor 04/26 |
2017-04-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 1, Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-20 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Wanzek Sorvaag Mathern |
2017-04-10 | House | Conference committee appointed Vigesaa Nathe Delmore |
2017-04-10 | House | Refused to concur |
2017-04-03 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2017-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-09 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |