ND SB2194 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 35 nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 35 nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 43-58-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the regulation of naturopaths; and to amend and reenact sections 43-58-01 and 43-58-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the regulation of naturopaths.
Title
The regulation of naturopaths.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] |
Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Jay Seibel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 35 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 22 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 22 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 35 nays 56 |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 3 0 |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 25 nays 22 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 25 |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, without recommendation 4 2 0 |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |