ND HB1470 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 54-52.4-02, 54-52.4-03, and 54-52.4-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to family leave for state employees; and to provide for a legislative management study of state employee leave policies.
Title
Family leave for state employees; and to provide for a legislative management study of state employee leave policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Signed by Governor 03/26 |
2019-03-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on table |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 6 |
2019-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2019-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |