ND HB1440 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 035 nays 057
Status: Introduced on January 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 035 nays 057
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Krebsbach, J. Lee, Schneider A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 43-15-35 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to permits to operate pharmacies.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Krebsbach, J. Lee, Schneider A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 43-15-35 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to permits to operate pharmacies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-13 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 035 nays 057 | |
2009-02-09 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 008 n 005 | |
2009-02-03 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-16 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1440.html |