NC S907 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Economic Growth Act
Title
Economic Growth Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Ch. SL 2022-24 | |
2022-06-30 | Ratified | |
2022-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-06-28 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Annexation
Chaptered
City Councils
Counties
County Commissioners
Davidson County
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Planning & Zoning
Ratified
Chaptered
City Councils
Counties
County Commissioners
Davidson County
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Planning & Zoning
Ratified