NC S875 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-28 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-28 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Town of Sunset Beach/Deannexation
Title
Town of Sunset Beach/Deannexation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-28 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-06 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-03 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Filed |