NC S82 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Achieving Business Efficiencies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Achieving Business Efficiencies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Sen. Amend. 1 Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-14SenateFiled
2017-02-15SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-02-15SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-02-16SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-02-16SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-27SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-06-27SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2017-06-27SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-28SenateReptd Fav
2017-06-28SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2017-06-28SenateAmend Adopted A1
2017-06-28SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-28SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-28SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2017-06-28HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2017-06-28HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-06-29HouseReptd Fav As Amended
2017-06-29HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-06-29HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-06-29HouseAmend Adopted SA1
2017-06-29HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-29HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-29HouseOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-30 Ratified
2017-06-30 Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2017
2017-07-25 Signed by Gov. 7/25/2017
2017-07-25 Ch. SL 2017-185

Same As/Similar To

H59 (Same As) 2017-02-08 - Filed

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=S82&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S82v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S82v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S82v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S82v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S82v4.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=441
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=442
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=895
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=896

Bill Comments

feedback