NC H59 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Ch. SL 2017-39
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Ch. SL 2017-39
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revenue Laws Technical Changes
Title
Revenue Laws Technical Changes
Sponsors
Rep. William Brawley [R] | Rep. Jason Saine [R] | Rep. John Szoka [R] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] |
Rep. Susan Martin [R] | Rep. Stephen Ross [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Ch. SL 2017-39 | |
2017-06-21 | Signed by Gov. 6/21/2017 | |
2017-06-14 | Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2017 | |
2017-06-13 | Ratified | |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-02-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-02-20 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/21/2017 |
2017-02-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-02-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-09 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S82 (Same As) 2017-07-25 - Ch. SL 2017-185