NC S808 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Ch. SL 2020-88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Medicaid Funding Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid Funding Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - A1 Dobson Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02 Ch. SL 2020-88
2020-07-02 Signed by Gov. 7/2/2020
2020-06-26 Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2020
2020-06-26 Ratified
2020-06-25SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-25SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2020-06-25SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-25SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2020-06-25HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2020-06-25HouseOrdered Engrossed
2020-06-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-25HouseAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-24HousePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-24HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-06-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-06-24HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2020-06-23HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-06-23HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2020-06-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-06-23HouseReptd Fav
2020-06-22HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2020-06-22HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2020-06-22HousePlaced On Cal For 06/23/2020
2020-06-22HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-06-22HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-18HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations
2020-06-18HouseWithdrawn From Com
2020-06-17HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-06-17HousePassed 1st Reading
2020-06-17HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2020-06-17SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2020-06-17SenateEngrossed
2020-06-17SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-16SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-16SenateAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-15SenateReptd Fav
2020-06-11SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-11SenateReptd Fav
2020-06-10SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2020-06-10SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-10SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-08SenateSequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Added
2020-06-08SenateSequential Referral To Finance Added
2020-06-08SenateSequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Stricken
2020-05-20SenateRe-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-05-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2020-05-20SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-05-20SenatePassed 1st Reading
2020-05-19SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S808
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S808v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S808v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S808v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S808v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S808v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S808v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S808v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S808v7.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S808v8.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/747
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/746
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/757
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1024
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/870
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1051
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1050

Bill Comments

feedback