NC S737 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-01 - Reptd Unfav
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-01 - Reptd Unfav
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Congressional Redistricting Plan 2021 - CCH-6
Title
Congressional Redistricting Plan 2021 - CCH-6
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-02 - Senate - Motion 10 Remove from Table (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-01 | Senate | Reptd Unfav |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Redistricting and Elections |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
163 | 201 | (n/a) | Citation Text |