NC S733 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Certain Towns Sewer Fee Collections
Title
Certain Towns Sewer Fee Collections
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance |
2016-06-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-02 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Filed |