NC S690 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-28 - Ch. SL 2019-233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-28 - Ch. SL 2019-233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications to 2019 Appointments Bill
Title
Modifications to 2019 Appointments Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-24 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-10-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-10-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-28 | Ch. SL 2019-233 | |
2019-10-28 | Ratified | |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-10-24 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-10-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/24/2019 |
2019-10-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2019-10-23 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 10/24/2019 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2019-10-22 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 10/08/2019 |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-10-03 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-10-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-10-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-10-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/02/2019 |
2019-10-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-10-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-08-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-08-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-08-27 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Filed |