NC S600 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Ch. SL 2017-94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Ch. SL 2017-94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Britny's Law: IPV Homicide
Title
Britny's Law: IPV Homicide
Sponsors
Sen. John Barefoot [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Jackson [D] | Sen. Danny Britt [R] | Sen. Kathryn Harrington [R] |
Sen. Joyce Waddell [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Ch. SL 2017-94 | |
2017-07-11 | Signed by Gov. 7/11/2017 | |
2017-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2017 | |
2017-06-26 | Ratified | |
2017-06-22 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-06-20 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2017-06-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Filed |