NC S578 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Vetoed 11/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reduce Franchise Tax/Expand Film Grants

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduce Franchise Tax/Expand Film Grants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-31 - House - A1 Pittman Third Reading (Y: 4 N: 106 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-10-31 - House - A1 Pittman M4 Previous Question Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - House - M4 Previous Question Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - House - Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - Motion 12 / Appeal Ruling of Chair Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-10-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 59 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-08 Vetoed 11/08/2019
2019-11-01 Pres. To Gov. 11/1/2019
2019-10-31 Ratified
2019-10-31SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-10-31SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-10-31SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2019-10-31SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-10-31HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-10-31HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-10-31HouseAmend Failed A1
2019-10-30HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-10-30HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-10-30HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-10-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-10-30HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-10-24HouseRef To Com On Finance
2019-10-24HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-10-24HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-10-24SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-10-24SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-10-23SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-10-22SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-10-22SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-10-17SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-10-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-03SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S578
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S578v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S578v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S578v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S578v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S578v4.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/617
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/621
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/886
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/885
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/650
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/898
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/897
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/895
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/896

Bill Comments

feedback