NC S513 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Ch. SL 2015-263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Ch. SL 2015-263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
North Carolina Farm Act of 2015
Title
North Carolina Farm Act of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 70 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - M4 Previous Question C RPT Adoption (Y: 67 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 3 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-09-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 99 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - House - A1 Yarborough Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 81 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2015-09-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 20 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - M4 Previous Question C RPT Adoption (Y: 67 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 3 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-09-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 99 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - House - A1 Yarborough Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 81 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2015-09-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 20 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-30 | Ch. SL 2015-263 | |
2015-09-30 | Signed by Gov. 9/30/2015 | |
2015-09-30 | Pres. To Gov. 09/30/2015 | |
2015-09-29 | Ratified | |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-09-29 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2015-09-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/29/2015 |
2015-09-28 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/29/2015 |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2015-09-28 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2015-09-28 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-09-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-09-28 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2015-09-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-24 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-09-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-09-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 |
2015-09-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-09-24 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-09-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/24/2015 |
2015-09-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-09-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-09-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-09-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2015-09-21 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Finance |
2015-09-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-09-15 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Finance |
2015-09-15 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-08-17 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-08-17 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-06-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-06-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-06-08 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Added |
2015-05-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Agriculture |
2015-05-27 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-05-21 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-05-20 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-05-19 | Engrossed | |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Amend Failed A3 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Filed |