NC S488 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer Protection- Invoice Advertisements
Title
Consumer Protection- Invoice Advertisements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-13 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
75 | 35 | (n/a) | Citation Text |