NC S465 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Ch. SL 2023-27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Ch. SL 2023-27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Cities/Remove & Dispose of Abandoned Vessels
Title
Cities/Remove & Dispose of Abandoned Vessels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-02 | Ch. SL 2023-27 | |
2023-06-02 | Signed by Gov. 6/2/2023 | |
2023-05-26 | Pres. To Gov. 5/26/2023 | |
2023-05-25 | Ratified | |
2023-05-24 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-05-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/24/2023 |
2023-05-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-05-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-05-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-05-22 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-25 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-24 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Boats & Watercraft
Chaptered
Coastal Resources
Counties
Lakes & Rivers
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Municipalities
Presented
Property
Public
Ratified
Transportation
Water Resources
Boats & Watercraft
Chaptered
Coastal Resources
Counties
Lakes & Rivers
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Municipalities
Presented
Property
Public
Ratified
Transportation
Water Resources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
153A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
153A | 132 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
160A | 205.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text |