NC S45 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Ch. SL 2023-83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Ch. SL 2023-83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
CADC Supervision Requirements
Title
CADC Supervision Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-07 | Ch. SL 2023-83 | |
2023-07-07 | Signed by Gov. 7/7/2023 | |
2023-06-30 | Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2023 | |
2023-06-29 | Ratified | |
2023-06-28 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-06-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-06-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2023 |
2023-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-06-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-22 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-02-23 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-22 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
90 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
90 | 113.31A | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 113.37A | (n/a) | Citation Text |