NC S392 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various Charter School Changes
Title
Various Charter School Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-16 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - House - A1 Meyer Second Reading (Y: 56 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-07-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - House - A1 Meyer Second Reading (Y: 56 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-07-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-07-29 | Vetoed 07/29/2019 | |
2019-07-19 | Pres. To Gov. 7/19/2019 | |
2019-07-18 | Ratified | |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-07-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-07-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-11 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A2 |
2019-07-11 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2019-07-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/11/2019 |
2019-07-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-06-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-05-30 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-30 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-22 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-18 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Filed |