NC S382 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Dental Practice Act Changes
Title
Dental Practice Act Changes
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Perry [R] | Sen. Kevin Corbin [R] | Sen. Todd Johnson [R] | Sen. Gale Adcock [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-22 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Conferees Reappointed |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Conf Com Dismissed |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/20/2023 |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2023-06-15 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-06-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-06-14 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-06-14 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-06-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-06-07 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-07 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-05-01 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
90 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
90 | 229 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 29 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 29.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 30 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 33 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 36 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 41 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 414.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text |