NC S378 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Ch. SL 2013-299
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Ch. SL 2013-299
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Assess Propane Dealers/Distributors
Title
Assess Propane Dealers/Distributors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | Ch. SL 2013-299 | |
2013-07-18 | Signed by Gov. 7/18/2013 | |
2013-07-11 | Pres. To Gov. 07/12/2013 | |
2013-07-11 | Ratified | |
2013-07-10 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-10 | House | Added to Calendar |
2013-07-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-07-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-06-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-06-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-06-03 | House | Ref to the Com on Public Utilities and Energy, if favorable, Finance |
2013-06-03 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-30 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Finance |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H403 (Same As) 2013-03-28 - Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Energy and Emerging Markets