NC S374 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

COVID-19/2020-2021 School Calendar Start

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19/2020-2021 School Calendar Start

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-07-08SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2020-07-07HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2020-07-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2020-07-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2020-07-07HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-07-07HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-07-07HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 4
2020-06-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-06-25HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2020-06-24HousePlaced On Cal For 06/25/2020
2020-06-24HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2020-06-23HousePlaced On Cal For 06/24/2020
2020-06-23HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2020-06-22HousePlaced On Cal For 06/23/2020
2020-06-22HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2020-06-19HousePlaced On Cal For 06/22/2020
2020-06-19HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-06-19HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 3
2020-06-18HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-06-18HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2020-06-17HousePlaced On Cal For 06/18/2020
2020-06-17HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-06-17HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2020-06-17HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-06-17HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-15HouseRe-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-06-15HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-07HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-07HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-02SenateAmend Failed A1
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-18SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-18SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-17SenateRe-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-11SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-28SenateRe-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-28SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-28SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-28SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-27SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback