NC S374 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-12 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
Pending: Senate Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-12 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
Pending: Senate Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Landowner Protection Act
Title
Landowner Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2011-05-12 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-05-11 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-10 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-05-10 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-21 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2011-03-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H762 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-231