NC S357 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Various Motor Vehicle Law Revisions
Title
Various Motor Vehicle Law Revisions
Sponsors
Sen. William Jackson [R] | Sen. Jim Perry [R] | Sen. Michael Lazzara [R] | Sen. Bobby Hanig [R] |
Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H448 (Same As) 2023-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Commerce
Fines & Penalties
Franchises
Licenses & Permits
Manufacturing
Motor Vehicles
Notification
Public
Retailing
Transportation
Fines & Penalties
Franchises
Licenses & Permits
Manufacturing
Motor Vehicles
Notification
Public
Retailing
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
20 | 288 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 296 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 75.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |