NC H448 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Various Motor Vehicle Law Revisions
Title
Various Motor Vehicle Law Revisions
Sponsors
Rep. Brenden Jones [R] | Rep. Stephen Ross [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] | Rep. Zack Forde-Hawkins [D] |
Rep. Larry Strickland [R] | Rep. Bill Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-27 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S357 (Same As) 2024-07-08 - Ch. SL 2024-40
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
20 | 288 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 296 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 75.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |