NC S354 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Vetoed 11/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Strengthening Educators' Pay Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Strengthening Educators' Pay Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-31 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - House - M4 Previous Question C RPT Adoption (Y: 60 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 62 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-07-15 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-07-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-08 Vetoed 11/08/2019
2019-11-01 Pres. To Gov. 11/1/2019
2019-10-31 Ratified
2019-10-31SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-10-31HouseConf Report Adopted
2019-10-31SenateConf Report Adopted
2019-10-30HousePlaced On Cal For 10/31/2019
2019-10-30HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
2019-10-30HouseReptd Fav For Adoption
2019-10-30HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations, Education
2019-10-30HouseConf Com Reported
2019-10-30SenatePlaced On Cal For 10/31/2019
2019-10-30SenateConf Com Reported
2019-10-30HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-10-30SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-07-15SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2019-07-11SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-07-10HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-09HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-09HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-08HousePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-08HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-06-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-25HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-23HouseRe-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-23HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-08HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-05-08SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-05-08SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-08SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-07SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-06SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-06SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-27SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-27SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-26SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-26SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-25SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S354
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S354v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S354v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S354v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S354v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S354v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S354v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/219
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/612
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/487
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/901
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/900
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/640

Bill Comments

feedback