NC S343 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Revise Vehicle Sale Laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise Vehicle Sale Laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-12HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-05-12SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-05-11SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-11SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-10SenateReptd Fav
2021-05-06SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-06SenateReptd Fav
2021-05-05SenateRe-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance
2021-05-05SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-05-05SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-04-21SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-21SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-25SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-25SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-24SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20(n/a)Citation Text
2075.1(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback