NC S323 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Ch. SL 2021-73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Ch. SL 2021-73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Municipal Power Agencies/Investments
Title
Joint Municipal Power Agencies/Investments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Ch. SL 2021-73 | |
2021-07-02 | Signed by Gov. 7/2/2021 | |
2021-06-24 | Pres. To Gov. 6/24/2021 | |
2021-06-23 | Ratified | |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/22/2021 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-06-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-06-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-06-15 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-06-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-09 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-08 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-02 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-02 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-15 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-14 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H257 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Subjects
Catawba County
Chaptered
Council Of State
Counties
Electricity Generation & Distribution
Funds & Accounts
Infrastructure
Investments
Local Government
Municipalities
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
State Treasurer
Swain County
Utilities
Chaptered
Council Of State
Counties
Electricity Generation & Distribution
Funds & Accounts
Infrastructure
Investments
Local Government
Municipalities
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
State Treasurer
Swain County
Utilities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
147 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
147 | 69.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
147 | 69.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
159B | 18 | (n/a) | Citation Text |