NC H257 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Municipal Power Agencies/Investments
Title
Joint Municipal Power Agencies/Investments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2021-03-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S323 (Same As) 2021-07-02 - Ch. SL 2021-73
Subjects
Catawba County
Council Of State
Counties
Electricity Generation & Distribution
Funds & Accounts
Infrastructure
Investments
Local Government
Municipalities
Public
Public Officials
State Treasurer
Utilities
Council Of State
Counties
Electricity Generation & Distribution
Funds & Accounts
Infrastructure
Investments
Local Government
Municipalities
Public
Public Officials
State Treasurer
Utilities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
147 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
147 | 69.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
159B | 18 | (n/a) | Citation Text |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H257 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H257v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H257v1.pdf |