NC S323 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
UNC Public Records/Athletic Conferences
Title
UNC Public Records/Athletic Conferences
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Lee [R] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Warren Daniel [R] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] |
Sen. Louis Pate [R] | Sen. Ronald Rabin [R] | Sen. Shirley Randleman [R] | Sen. Norman Sanderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 59 N: 53 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - A2 Collins Second Reading (Y: 51 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-06-26 - House - A2 Collins M8 Re-Refer Education - Universities Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 81 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-06-22 - House - A1 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 59 N: 53 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - A2 Collins Second Reading (Y: 51 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-06-26 - House - A2 Collins M8 Re-Refer Education - Universities Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 81 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-06-22 - House - A1 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Ch. SL 2017-175 | |
2017-07-21 | Signed by Gov. 7/21/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Concurred In H Amend S323v1 |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2017 |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Amend |
2017-06-27 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-26 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2017-06-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017 |
2017-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-22 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-22 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/22/2017 |
2017-06-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H412 (Same As) 2017-03-21 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House