NC S322 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

2021 Revenue Laws Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

2021 Revenue Laws Changes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenateRe-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-28SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-28SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-28SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-04-28SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-22SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-22SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-22SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-22SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H279 (Same As) 2021-04-27 - Ch. SL 2021-16

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105(n/a)Citation Text
105113.11(n/a)Citation Text
105113.18(n/a)Citation Text
105113.29(n/a)Citation Text
105113.33(n/a)Citation Text
105113.35(n/a)Citation Text
105113.37(n/a)Citation Text
105113.4(n/a)Citation Text
105113.4B(n/a)Citation Text
105113.4F(n/a)Citation Text
105113.4H(n/a)Citation Text
105113.4I(n/a)Citation Text
105113.4J(n/a)Citation Text
105113.4K(n/a)Citation Text
105113.8(n/a)Citation Text
105113.83(n/a)Citation Text
105113.86(n/a)Citation Text
105129.71(n/a)Citation Text
105129.75(n/a)Citation Text
105130.5(n/a)Citation Text
105130.7B(n/a)Citation Text
105130.8A(n/a)Citation Text
105131(n/a)Citation Text
105131.1(n/a)Citation Text
105131.1A(n/a)Citation Text
105131.7(n/a)Citation Text
105131.8(n/a)Citation Text
105153.3(n/a)Citation Text
105153.5(n/a)Citation Text
105153.5A(n/a)Citation Text
105153.9(n/a)Citation Text
105154(n/a)Citation Text
105154.1(n/a)Citation Text
105160.4(n/a)Citation Text
105163.38(n/a)Citation Text
105163.39(n/a)Citation Text
105163.7(n/a)Citation Text
105163.8(n/a)Citation Text
105164.13(n/a)Citation Text
105164.13E(n/a)Citation Text
105164.3(n/a)Citation Text
105164.4(n/a)Citation Text
105164.44N(n/a)Citation Text
105187.1(n/a)Citation Text
105187.9(n/a)Citation Text
105228.5(n/a)Citation Text
105228.90(n/a)Citation Text
105236(n/a)Citation Text
105241.6(n/a)Citation Text
105251(n/a)Citation Text
105252.1(n/a)Citation Text
105259(n/a)Citation Text
105278(n/a)Citation Text
105449.115(n/a)Citation Text
105449.115A(n/a)Citation Text
105449.123(n/a)Citation Text
105449.45(n/a)Citation Text
105449.47B(n/a)Citation Text
105449.60(n/a)Citation Text
105449.76(n/a)Citation Text
10583(n/a)Citation Text
119(n/a)Citation Text
11919(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback