NC H279 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Ch. SL 2021-16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

COVID-19 Related Tax Chngs/UI Tech Correct

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19 Related Tax Chngs/UI Tech Correct

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27 Ch. SL 2021-16
2021-04-27 Signed by Gov. 4/27/2021
2021-04-27 Pres. To Gov. 4/27/2021
2021-04-27 Ratified
2021-04-27SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-04-27SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-26SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-22SenateReptd Fav
2021-04-21SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-21SenateReptd Fav
2021-04-19SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-19SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-19SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-19SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-04-16HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-04-15HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-14HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-13HousePlaced On Cal For 04/14/2021
2021-04-13HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-04-13HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-13HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-13HouseRuled Material
2021-04-13HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-15HouseRef to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S322 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105(n/a)Citation Text
105241.21(n/a)Citation Text
105277.1(n/a)Citation Text
105277.1B(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H279
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H279v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H279v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H279v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H279v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H279v4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50080/0/H279-PCS30260-SVxfr-12
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H279-SMSV-15(CSSVxfr-12)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H279-SMBA-30(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H279-SMBA-33(e2)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/96
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/107
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/104
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/110

Bill Comments 750

feedback