NC S314 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - Ch. SL 2021-124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Local Gov. Commission Assistance Toolkit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Gov. Commission Assistance Toolkit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-19 - Senate - Conference Rpt No. 2 Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-18 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-17 - House - Third Reading (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-30 Ch. SL 2021-124
2021-08-30 Signed by Gov. 8/30/2021
2021-08-24 Pres. To Gov. 8/24/2021
2021-08-23 Ratified
2021-08-19SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-08-19SenateConf Report #2 Adopted
2021-08-19SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2021-08-19SenateConf Com #2 Reported
2021-08-19SenateConf Rept Withdrawn
2021-08-18SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/19/2021
2021-08-18SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-08-18HouseConf Report #2 Adopted
2021-08-18HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-08-18HouseConf Com #2 Reported
2021-08-04HouseConf Rpt Withdrawn
2021-08-04HouseConf Rpt Recon
2021-06-24SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-24SenateConf Com Reported
2021-06-23HouseConf Report Adopted
2021-06-23HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-06-23HouseConf Com Reported
2021-06-22HouseConferees Changed
2021-06-22HouseConf Com Appointed
2021-06-22SenateConf Com Appointed
2021-06-22SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2021-06-17SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/22/2021
2021-06-17SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2021-06-17HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2021-06-17HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-06-16HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-06-16HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-06-16HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-06-16HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-06-08HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-08HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-06-02HouseRe-ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-02HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-13HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-13HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2021-05-13SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2021-05-13SenateEngrossed
2021-05-13SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-12SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-12SenateAmend Adopted A1
2021-05-11SenateReptd Fav
2021-05-11SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-11SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-05-11SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-18SenateRe-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-18SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-18SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-18SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-17SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105472(n/a)Citation Text
120163(n/a)Citation Text
153A82(n/a)Citation Text
15925(n/a)Citation Text
160A148(n/a)Citation Text
160A825(n/a)Citation Text
160A826(n/a)Citation Text
160A831(n/a)Citation Text
160A832(n/a)Citation Text
160A833(n/a)Citation Text
160A834(n/a)Citation Text
160A841(n/a)Citation Text
160A842(n/a)Citation Text
160A845(n/a)Citation Text
160A846(n/a)Citation Text
160A848(n/a)Citation Text
160A849(n/a)Citation Text
160A850(n/a)Citation Text
160A851(n/a)Citation Text
160A853(n/a)Citation Text
160A854(n/a)Citation Text
160A855(n/a)Citation Text
160A856(n/a)Citation Text
160A857(n/a)Citation Text
160A858(n/a)Citation Text
160A859(n/a)Citation Text
160A860(n/a)Citation Text
160A861(n/a)Citation Text
160A862(n/a)Citation Text
160A863(n/a)Citation Text
160A864(n/a)Citation Text
160A865(n/a)Citation Text
160A866(n/a)Citation Text
160A867(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S314
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S314v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S314v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S314v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S314v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S314v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S314v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S314v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S314v7.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51562/0/S314-PCS35285-TExfr-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51851/0/S314-A-NBC-8964
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52025/0/S314-PCS35292-SHxf-40
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52168/0/S314-PCS35298-STxf-20
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52751/0/S314-PCCS45456-ST-3
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52811/0/S314-PCCS-NBC-9129
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S314-SMBA-46(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S314-SMSH-83(e3)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S314-SMSH-92(e4)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S314-SMST-28(CSSTxf-20)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S314-SMST-28(CSSTxf-20)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S314-SMST-30(e5)-v-1
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/206
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/205
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/218
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/399
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/401
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/303
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/414
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/479
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/397

Bill Comments 750

feedback