NC S297 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-27 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-27 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Winston-Salem/Local Development
Title
Winston-Salem/Local Development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-06-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-20 | House | Ref To Com On Government |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-16 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-05-15 | Engrossed | |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Commerce |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Filed |