NC S290 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - Ch. SL 2019-182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - Ch. SL 2019-182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
ABC Regulatory Reform Bill
Title
ABC Regulatory Reform Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-16 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - House - A1 Boles Third Reading (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - House - A2 Hurley Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-07-11 - House - A3 Hurley Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-07-11 - House - Third Reading (Y: 86 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 91 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - House - A1 Boles Third Reading (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - House - A2 Hurley Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-07-11 - House - A3 Hurley Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-07-11 - House - Third Reading (Y: 86 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 91 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-29 | Ch. SL 2019-182 | |
2019-07-29 | Signed by Gov. 7/29/2019 | |
2019-07-19 | Pres. To Gov. 7/19/2019 | |
2019-07-18 | Ratified | |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-07-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-07-11 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2019-07-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-11 | House | Amend Failed A3 |
2019-07-11 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2019-07-11 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-07-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-10 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-07-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-06-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-26 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-06-25 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-06-25 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/25/2019 |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2019 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H378 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - Ref to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House