NC S278 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prop./Fam. Law-Reimburse Prop. Expenditures
Title
Prop./Fam. Law-Reimburse Prop. Expenditures
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Galey [R] | Sen. Danny Britt [R] | Sen. Michael Lazzara [R] | Sen. Jim Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Ch. SL 2022-12 | |
2022-06-29 | Signed by Gov. 6/29/2022 | |
2022-06-23 | Pres. To Gov. 6/23/2022 | |
2022-06-22 | Ratified | |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/21/2022 |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2022-06-15 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2022-06-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-10-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-10-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-09-01 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 3, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-09-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-31 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-31 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-30 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Attorneys
Chaptered
Debtor & Creditor
Family Issues
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Liens
Occupations
Presented
Property
Public
Public Records
Ratified
Real Estate
Recordation Of Instruments
Records
Chaptered
Debtor & Creditor
Family Issues
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Liens
Occupations
Presented
Property
Public
Public Records
Ratified
Real Estate
Recordation Of Instruments
Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
41 | 61 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47A | 2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47B | 3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47C | 1-102 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47C | 2-101 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47C | 2-105 | (n/a) | Citation Text |