NC S196 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Ch. SL 2021-91
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Ch. SL 2021-91
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
GSC Sale of Property Amend/Delay Prosec Split
Title
GSC Sale of Property Amend/Delay Prosec Split
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-14 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-22 | Ch. SL 2021-91 | |
2021-07-22 | Signed by Gov. 7/22/2021 | |
2021-07-16 | Pres. To Gov. 7/16/2021 | |
2021-07-15 | Ratified | |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/14/2021 |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-07-01 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-06-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-30 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-06-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-06-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-14 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-14 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-08 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-05 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Attorneys
Burke County
Caldwell County
Catawba County
Chaptered
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Counties
Courts
Debtor & Creditor
Deeds
District Attorneys
Estates
Fees
Foreclosures
Notary Public
Notification
Presented
Property
Public
Public Records
Ratified
Real Estate
Recordation Of Instruments
Records
Register Of Deeds
Sales & Conveyances
Session Laws
Tax Collection
Taxation
Titles
Burke County
Caldwell County
Catawba County
Chaptered
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Counties
Courts
Debtor & Creditor
Deeds
District Attorneys
Estates
Fees
Foreclosures
Notary Public
Notification
Presented
Property
Public
Public Records
Ratified
Real Estate
Recordation Of Instruments
Records
Register Of Deeds
Sales & Conveyances
Session Laws
Tax Collection
Taxation
Titles
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
1 | 339.36 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
1 | 339.54 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
105 | 373 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | 374 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | 375 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | 378 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
10B | 65 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
10B | 69 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
10B | 71 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
10B | 72 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
41 | 56 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
41 | 75 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
46A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
46A | 83 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
46A | 84.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 108.11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 108.20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 108.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 18 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 2.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 37.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 48 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 51 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 53 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 53.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 72 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 97 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 97.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
93A | 12 | (n/a) | Citation Text |