NC S143 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Pinehurst-Limit Commercial Devel. Moratoria
Title
Pinehurst-Limit Commercial Devel. Moratoria
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas McInnis [R] | Sen. Bobby Hanig [R] | Sen. Steve Jarvis [R] | Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] |
Sen. Jim Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-05-03 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Commerce
Counties
Local
Local Government
Moore County
Moratoriums
Municipalities
Pinehurst
Planning & Zoning
Property
Counties
Local
Local Government
Moore County
Moratoriums
Municipalities
Pinehurst
Planning & Zoning
Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
160D | 107 | (n/a) | Citation Text |