NC S1246 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Four-Year Cohort Graduation Rate
Title
Four-Year Cohort Graduation Rate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-06 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-111 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Ratified | |
2010-07-06 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-02 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-02 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2010-06-30 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-06-29 | Placed On Cal For 6/30/2010 | |
2010-06-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-08 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2010-06-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-03 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-02 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-20 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1877 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref To Com On Education