NC S105 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Failed To Override Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Clarify Emergency Powers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarify Emergency Powers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-08 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - A1 Hall, D. Second Reading (Y: 64 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 63 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08SenateFailed To Override Veto
2020-07-06SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2020
2020-07-02 Vetoed 07/02/2020
2020-06-26 Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2020
2020-06-26 Ratified
2020-06-26SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-26SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2020-06-26SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-25SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2020-06-25HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2020-06-25HouseOrdered Engrossed
2020-06-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-24HousePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-24HouseAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-23HousePlaced On Cal For 06/24/2020
2020-06-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-06-23HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-10-31HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-10-31HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-10-31HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-10-31HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-07-08HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-08HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-08HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-08HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-25HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-13HouseRef to the Com on Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-12HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-03-12SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-03-12SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-12SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-07SenatePlaced On Cal For 03/12/2019
2019-03-07SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-06SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-06SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-03-06SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-26SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-26SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-25SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-25SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-21SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S105
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S105v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S105v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S105v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S105v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S105v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S105v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S105v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/34
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1034
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1033
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1047
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/879
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/888

Bill Comments

feedback