NC H986 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-23 - Ch. SL 2009-158
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-23 - Ch. SL 2009-158
Summary
Spencer/Amend Property Description.
Title
Spencer/Amend Property Description.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-23 | Ch. SL 2009-158 | |
2009-06-23 | Ratified | |
2009-06-22 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-18 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-06-17 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-05 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-05-05 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-04 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Placed On Cal For 4/30/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-15 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-04-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-02 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H986 |