NC H974 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-26)
Status: Passed on June 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-23 - Ch. Res 2022-3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Honor Jerry Carter, Former Member

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honor Jerry Carter, Former Member

Sponsors

Rep. Sarah Stevens [R]Rep. Bobby Hanig [R]Rep. Wayne Sasser [R]Rep. Reece Pyrtle [R]
Rep. James Adams [R]Rep. Gale Adcock [D]Rep. John Ager [D]Rep. Larry Arp [R]
Rep. Johnnie Autry [D]Rep. Amber Baker [D]Rep. Kristin Baker [R]Rep. Cynthia Ball [D]
Rep. Mary Belk [D]Rep. John Bell [R]Rep. Hugh Blackwell [R]Rep. James Boles [R]
Rep. John Bradford [R]Rep. William Brisson [R]Rep. Mark Brody [R]Rep. Terry Brown [D]
Rep. Deb Butler [D]Rep. Becky Carney [D]Rep. James Clampitt [R]Rep. Ashton Clemmons [D]
Rep. George Cleveland [R]Rep. Linda Cooper-Suggs [D]Rep. Carla Cunningham [D]Rep. Robert Davis [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Elmore [R]Rep. John Faircloth [R]Rep. Brian Farkas [D]Rep. Susan Fisher [D]
Rep. James Gailliard [D]Rep. Rosa Gill [D]Rep. Karl Gillespie [R]Rep. Edward Goodwin [R]
Rep. Charles Graham [D]Rep. Dudley Greene [R]Rep. Destin Hall [R]Rep. Kyle Hall [R]
Rep. Jonathan Hardister [R]Rep. Wesley Harris [D]Rep. Mary Harrison [D]Rep. Kelly Hastings [R]
Rep. Chris Humphrey [R]Rep. Rachel Hunt [D]Rep. Howard Hunter [D]Rep. Patricia Hurley [R]
Rep. Ricky Hurtado [D]Rep. Francis Iler [R]Rep. Joseph John [D]Rep. Jake Johnson [R]
Rep. Brenden Jones [R]Rep. Keith Kidwell [R]Rep. Donny Lambeth [R]Rep. Nasif Majeed [D]
Rep. David Martin [D]Rep. Patricia McElraft [R]Rep. Jeffrey McNeely [R]Rep. Allen McNeill [R]
Rep. Graig Meyer [D]Rep. Charles Miller [R]Rep. Grey Mills [R]Rep. Timothy Moffitt [R]
Rep. Timothy Moore [R]Rep. Ben Moss [R]Rep. Erin Pare [R]

Roll Calls

2022-06-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-23HouseCh. Res 2022-3
2022-06-23 Ratified
2022-06-22SenateOrdered Enrolled
2022-06-22SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2022-06-22SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2022-06-22SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2022-06-22SenatePassed 1st Reading
2022-06-22SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2022-06-22HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2022-06-22HousePassed 3rd Reading
2022-06-22HousePassed 2nd Reading
2022-06-16HousePlaced On Cal For 06/22/2022
2022-06-16HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-09-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-09-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-09-08HouseFiled

Subjects


North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback